judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-94-00156-CR
03-94-00156-CR
03/31/1994
DWI
Tony Anthony Brown
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/11/1996CASE STORED
01/11/1995Mandate Issued
11/23/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/30/1994Submitted
09/30/1994Submission
08/31/1994Brief filed
08/31/1994Case ready to be set
08/31/1994Submission
08/19/1994Brief filed
07/27/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/27/1994Order EnteredMotion or Writ Granted
07/13/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/22/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/20/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/08/1994Appellant's brief overdue notice in criminal case
04/15/1994Statement of Facts Filed
04/15/1994Transcript & SF Filed
04/13/1994Statement of Facts Received
03/31/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
03/31/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/11/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State Prosecuting AttorneyInterested partyThe Honorable Matthew W. Paul
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasThe Honorable Richard J. Miller
Brown, Tony AnthonyAppellantMr. F. Edward Brown
Court Of Criminal AppealsInterested partyThe Honorable Troy C. Bennett Jr.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 2
Bell
2C93-4957
90 days/$400 (PROBATED)