judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 06-94-00067-CV
06-94-00067-CV
03/31/1994
Mandamus/prohibition
Telephone and Data Systems, Inc., United States Cellular Corporation, and Texas RSA #11, Inc.
The Honorable Donald R. Ross, Judge, 4th Judicial District Court, Rusk County, Texas
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/28/2002Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
04/13/1994Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/13/1994Motion to File DispOverruled
04/13/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
04/13/1994Reply Brief Filed
04/08/1994Response to Motion
04/04/1994LETTER
03/31/1994MOTION FILED
03/31/1994Motion for leave to file
03/31/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/13/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The Honorable Donald R. RossRespondentHon. Donald R. Ross
Townes Telecommunications EtalAppelleeRon Adkison
Hon. T. John Ward
Hon. James M. Caplinger Jr.
Telephone & Data SystemsAppellantHon. Rod Phelan
Hon. Richard J. O'brien
Gregory D. Smith
Trial Court Information
Honorable John M. Marshall