judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-94-00158-CR
03-94-00158-CR
03/31/1994
Robbery
Michael Smith
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/14/1997CASE STORED
07/30/1996Mandate Acknowledgment
04/23/1996Mandate Issued
12/11/1995Case returned from higher court
11/08/1995Petition for discretionary review refused
08/28/1995Case forwarded to higher court
08/21/1995Peition for Review disposed in Supreme Court
07/24/1995Motion ext time file Petition for Disc. ReviewMotion or Writ Granted
06/21/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
05/25/1995Motion for rehearing filed
05/10/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/13/1995Submitted
03/13/1995Submission
02/09/1995Brief filed
02/09/1995Case ready to be set
02/09/1995Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/09/1995Submission
02/07/1995Brief received, not filed
01/27/1995Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/03/1995Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/28/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/05/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/28/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/27/1994Brief filed
10/19/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/19/1994Order EnteredMotion or Writ Granted
10/06/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/01/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/25/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/29/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/23/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/31/1994miscellaneous motion dispDismissed
05/25/1994miscellaneous motion filed
05/24/1994Statement of Facts Filed
05/23/1994Statement of Facts Filed
05/16/1994Statement of facts overdue
05/11/1994Affidavit received
05/11/1994Transcript Filed
03/31/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
03/31/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/23/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasThe Honorable Ronald Earle
Ms. Lisa Stewart
State Prosecuting AttorneyInterested partyThe Honorable Matthew W. Paul
Smith, MichaelAppellantMr. Keith S. Hampton
Court Of Criminal AppealsInterested partyThe Honorable Troy C. Bennett Jr.
Trial Court Information
147th District Court
Travis
Honorable L. L. Fuller
0940237
25 yrs./$10,000 fine