judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-94-00157-CR
03-94-00157-CR
03/31/1994
Theft
Morris Drew Adcock
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/11/1996CASE STORED
07/19/1995Mandate Issued
05/01/1995Order EnteredMotion or Writ Granted
04/18/1995Miscellaneous motion received
02/27/1995Motion ext time file Petition for Disc. ReviewMotion or Writ Granted
02/01/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/02/1995Submitted
01/02/1995Submission
12/02/1994Brief filed
12/02/1994Case ready to be set
12/02/1994Submission
11/10/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/07/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/13/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/11/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/16/1994Brief filed
08/31/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/31/1994Order EnteredMotion or Writ Granted
08/19/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/21/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/15/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/20/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/16/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/17/1994Transcript Filed
05/13/1994Exhibits filed
05/13/1994Statement of Facts Filed
04/15/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
04/15/1994Mot for Ext Transcript DispMotion or Writ Granted
04/11/1994Mot - Ext. to File Transcript
04/11/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
03/31/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
03/31/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/19/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Adcock, Morris DrewAppellantMr. Morris Drew Adcock
Mr. Douglas D. Behrendt
State Prosecuting AttorneyInterested partyThe Honorable Matthew W. Paul
Court Of Criminal AppealsInterested partyThe Honorable Troy C. Bennett Jr.
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasMr. Charles R. Kimbrough
Trial Court Information
22nd District Court
Caldwell
Honorable Robert Pfeuffer
93-144
20 yrs.