judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-94-00153-CR
03-94-00153-CR
03/31/1994
Robbery
Charles Kyle Williams, a/k/a James Tennard
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/11/1996CASE STORED
04/26/1995Mandate Issued
03/08/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/16/1995Submitted
02/16/1995Submission
01/17/1995Case ready to be set
01/17/1995Letter received
01/17/1995Submission
01/02/1995Brief filed
11/17/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/15/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/17/1994Statement of Facts Filed
09/21/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
09/15/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
06/21/1994Transcript Filed
06/16/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
06/13/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
03/31/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
03/31/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/26/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasThe Honorable Ken Anderson
State Prosecuting AttorneyInterested partyThe Honorable Matthew W. Paul
Williams, Charles Kyle A/k/aAppellantMs. Patricia J. Cummings
Court Of Criminal AppealsInterested partyThe Honorable Troy C. Bennett Jr.
Trial Court Information
277th District Court
Williamson
Honorable Johnny William Carter
93-068-K277
Ct.I-16 yrs./Ct.II-16 yrs.