judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-94-00115-CR
02-94-00115-CR
03/31/1994
Theft
Martinez, Abraham Corpus
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1997Mandate Issued
05/07/1997Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
07/17/1996Order Entered
07/16/1996Motion for Dismissal FiledMotion or Writ Granted
09/14/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/14/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/30/1995Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
08/03/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/27/1995Submitted
06/27/1995Submission
06/13/1995Amended Brief Filed
06/13/1995Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/13/1995Motion for Continuance DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/13/1995Motion for Continuance Filed
06/12/1995Motion Filed
03/29/1995Brief Filed
03/29/1995Case ready to be set
11/22/1994Brief Filed
11/21/1994Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/21/1994No Description Available.
11/02/1994Motion Filed
07/14/1994Submission
07/11/1994Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits
05/24/1994Motion to Substitute Attorney DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/12/1994Motion to Substitute Attorney Filed
03/31/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
03/31/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/05/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Martinez, Abraham CorpusCriminal - AppellantRandy Taylor
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasCharles M. Mallin
Trial Court Information
213th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable R. E. Thornton
0404629D
7 YRS PROBATION