judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-94-00154-CR
03-94-00154-CR
03/31/1994
Burglary
Jesus DeLuna Flores
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/11/1996CASE STORED
07/27/1995Mandate Issued
06/07/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/18/1995Submitted
05/18/1995Submission
04/18/1995Case ready to be set
04/18/1995Letter received
04/18/1995Submission
04/11/1995Brief filed
02/28/1995Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/23/1995Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/23/1995Statement of Facts Filed
12/05/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/28/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
08/24/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
08/19/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
06/21/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
06/17/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
06/17/1994Transcript Filed
03/31/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
03/31/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/27/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasMr. John M. Bradley
State Prosecuting AttorneyInterested partyThe Honorable Matthew W. Paul
Flores, Jesus DelunaAppellantMs. Patricia J. Cummings
Court Of Criminal AppealsInterested partyThe Honorable Troy C. Bennett Jr.
Trial Court Information
368th District Court
Williamson
Honorable Burt Carnes
93-279-K368
60 yrs./$5000 fine