judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-94-00117-CR
02-94-00117-CR
03/31/1994
Other Drug Possession or Delivery
Sanchez, Jose R.
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/23/1996Mandate Issued
12/13/1995Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
12/13/1995Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCADismissed
09/27/1995Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
08/25/1995Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/25/1995Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
08/11/1995Response Filed
08/11/1995Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
08/08/1995Motion Filed
07/13/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/26/1995Response Filed
06/16/1995Motion for Rehearing Filed
06/08/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/08/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/08/1995Opinion issuedReversed and rendered & reversed and remanded
06/08/1995Motion for Rehearing Granted
05/26/1995No Description Available.
05/18/1995Order Entered
05/08/1995Response Filed
04/28/1995Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/28/1995Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/13/1995Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
02/22/1995Letter
02/22/1995Submitted
02/22/1995Submission
02/17/1995Letter
02/17/1995Order Entered
12/21/1994Case ready to be set
12/21/1994Brief Filed
11/15/1994Brief Filed
09/02/1994No Description Available.
08/25/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
08/23/1994No Description Available.
08/22/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
08/19/1994No Description Available.
07/28/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
07/27/1994No Description Available.
06/23/1994Motion to Substitute Attorney DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/23/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
06/20/1994No Description Available.
06/20/1994Motion to Substitute Attorney Filed
05/05/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
05/04/1994No Description Available.
04/25/1994Submission
04/19/1994Exhibits Filed
04/19/1994No Description Available.
03/31/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
03/31/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/23/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasBetty Marshall
Sanchez, Jose R.Criminal - AppellantMichael Logan Ware
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 4
Tarrant
Honorable Don Leonard, Criminal District Court No. 3
0496143D
20YRS IDTDCJ/$10,000 FINE