judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: WR-4,389-06
WR-4,389-06
04/01/1994
1107-HC
BROWN, PRINCE JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/09/1994ORDER ISSUEDAbuse of Writ
09/22/1994MISC DOCUMENT RECD
07/15/1994MISC DOCUMENT RECD
04/19/1994MISC DOCUMENT RECD
04/07/1994MISC DOCUMENT RECD
04/01/1994WRIT RECEIVED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/09/1994STOREDWRIT STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Brown, Jr., PrinceApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)
Court of Appeals Information:
06-89-00016-CR
6th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
71st District Court
Harrison
88-0279-C