judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00080-CV
07-94-00080-CV
03/31/1994
Miscellaneous civil
City of Lubbock, Texas
Corbin, Webb and Mary Helen
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/04/1997Mandate Issued
09/03/1997Motion to stay disposedDENIED
08/20/1997Motion to Stay Deadlines, Opinions, Mandate, etc.
08/11/1997Case Returned from Higher Court
08/05/1997Motion to Withdraw Attorney FiledOverruled
07/25/1997Motion to Withdraw Attorney Filed
01/10/1997Case Forwarded to Higher Court
01/07/1997Motion to ReconsiderOverruled
01/07/1997Writ of Habeas Corpus, Prohibition, Etc.
12/27/1996Motion to Reconsider
12/10/1996Motion to Withdraw Attorney FiledGRANT
11/25/1996Extension filed with Supreme Court
11/25/1996Motion to Withdraw Attorney Filed
10/28/1996Extension filed with Supreme Court
10/09/1996Mot. for extension of time to file Rehearing DispOverruled
10/09/1996Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
09/09/1996Mot. for extension of time to file rehearing filed
08/30/1996Mot. for extension of time to file Rehearing DispGRANT
08/08/1996Mot. for extension of time to file rehearing filed
07/31/1996Mot. for extension of time to file rehearing filedGRANT
07/09/1996Mot. for extension of time to file rehearing filed
07/09/1996Motion for Rehearing Filed
06/26/1996Mot. for extension of time to file Rehearing DispGRANT
06/14/1996Mot. for extension of time to file rehearing filed
05/20/1996Mot. for extension of time to file Rehearing DispGRANT
05/07/1996Mot. for extension of time to file rehearing filed
04/30/1996Opinion issuedAffirmed, Reversed/Rendered, Reversed/Remanded
02/06/1995Submitted
02/06/1995Submission
01/31/1995Supplemental Brief Filed
01/12/1995Submission
08/30/1994Brief Filed
08/30/1994Case ready to be set
07/08/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
06/24/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
06/03/1994Brief Filed
05/17/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispGRANT
05/09/1994Do not use
05/05/1994Do not use
05/03/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
04/06/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispGRANT
03/31/1994Do not use
03/31/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/24/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/04/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City Of Lubbock, TexasAppellantCecil Kuhne
William J. Wade
Corbin, Webb And Mary HelenAppelleeMr. James Bruce Bennett
Trial Court Information
137th District Court
Lubbock
Honorable Cecil G. Puryear
90-531,690