judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00667-CV
14-89-00667-CV
07/19/1989
Mandamus/prohibition
Olbrich, Douglas F. Et Al
Touchy, Hugo Judge of 129th Judicial District, Harris
Yes
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/07/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
01/29/1990Case stored
12/14/1989Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
12/13/1989Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
12/01/1989Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
11/16/1989Opinion issuedGRANTED
11/16/1989Opinion issuedGRANTED
10/18/1989Submitted
10/18/1989Submission
10/18/1989Submitted
09/28/1989Reply Brief Filed
09/18/1989Submission
08/18/1989Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus DISPOSED-APP,REL,RESGRANTED
08/18/1989Petition for writ of mandamus FILED-REL,RES
08/18/1989Petition for writ of mandamus FILED-REL,RES
08/11/1989Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
08/10/1989Mtn.ext.time file response DISPOSED-ANT,APE,MOOT
08/04/1989Reply Brief Filed
07/31/1989Motion to extend time to file response FILED
07/25/1989Court's request for a response
07/25/1989Petition for Writ of mandamus RECEIVED - REL
07/19/1989Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus FILED-APP,REL,RES
07/19/1989Petition for Writ of mandamus RECEIVED - REL
07/19/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/07/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentJudge, 129th District Court
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRelatorC. Charles Dippel
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentPaul W. Nimmons, Jr.
Trial Court Information
129th District Court
Harris
Honorable HUGO A. TOUCHY