judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00747-CV
01-89-00747-CV
07/18/1989
Miscellaneous/other civil
Vollmer, Karl
Thompson, Raymond d.b.a. Redtco Construction
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/08/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
02/08/1990Opinion issuedDismissed
02/08/1990Opinion issuedDismissed
02/08/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/30/1990Submitted
01/30/1990Submission
01/30/1990Submitted
01/09/1990Motion to dismiss appeal
12/08/1989Submission
10/19/1989Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
10/18/1989Motion for leave to fileMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
10/12/1989Motion for oral argumentGrant motion
10/12/1989Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
10/05/1989Motion to dismiss appeal disposedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
10/02/1989Motion for oral argument
09/28/1989Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
09/25/1989Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
09/18/1989Filing fee paid
09/12/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
09/12/1989Case ready to be set
09/12/1989Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
09/12/1989Case ready to be set
09/07/1989Motion for oral argumentGrant motion
09/05/1989Motion to dismiss appeal
09/01/1989Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
08/24/1989Motion for oral argument
08/18/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
08/07/1989Filing fee paid
07/20/1989Statement of facts filed
07/18/1989Transcript filed
07/18/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/31/1989Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/08/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - AppellantDavid W. Showalter
StateAppellantGlenn J. Fahl
Trial Court Information
215th District Court
Harris
Honorable EUGENE CHAMBERS
86-55812