judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-89-00179-CR
12-89-00179-CR
07/18/1989
Other Drug Possession
Harris, Darrell D.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/31/1992
08/26/1992Mandate Issued
08/26/1992No Description Available.
08/10/1992
07/24/1992Order Entered
06/18/1992Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/18/1992Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
04/08/1992motion for rehearing filed
03/24/1992Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
03/24/1992Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/23/1991Submitted
09/23/1991Submission
08/21/1991
08/21/1991Submission
02/21/1990
02/14/1990Brief Filed
02/14/1990Case ready to be set
01/18/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/18/1990Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
01/12/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/29/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/29/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
12/22/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/01/1989Brief Filed
11/17/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/17/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
11/07/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/20/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/20/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
10/10/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/14/1989
09/07/1989No Description Available.
07/18/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/17/1989Judgment from the Trial Court
07/13/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/26/1992RetentionCriminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value)
08/31/1992Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Harris, Darrell D.Criminal - AppellantMs. Patricia Ray
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasMs. C. Patrice Savage
Trial Court Information
124th District Court
Gregg
Honorable Alvin G Khoury
17,385-B
50 yrs.TDC-1st ct. 60 2d