judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00734-CV
01-89-00734-CV
07/18/1989
Miscellaneous/other civil
Campbell, Henry
Maness, Michael
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/31/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/31/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/11/1990No petition for review or writ of error was filed
12/29/1989Motion for rehearing was not filed
12/14/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
12/14/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
08/29/1989Notice of dismissal
07/18/1989Transcript filed
07/18/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/26/1989Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/31/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppelleeHenry Muller
StateAppelleeMark Vela
StateAppellantGerald B. Scheve
Trial Court Information
Co Civil Ct at Law No 3
Harris
Honorable CHARLES COUSSONS
511,063