judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KODY NATHANIEL HESS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0032)
Case Number:S-07-0032Case Docketed On:02/09/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:KODY NATHANIEL HESS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:KODY NATHANIEL HESS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKody Nathaniel HessDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Donna D. Domonkos
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/09/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/09/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/09/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/28/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/29/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/11/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/14/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/25/2007Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
06/27/2007Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
06/27/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal