judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

O'CONNOR VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 34622
Short Caption:O'CONNOR VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35254
Lower Court Case(s):Churchill Co. - Tenth Judicial District - 24380Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/05/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
08/05/1999Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Writ of Mandamus; Points and Authoriites and Request for Waiver of Filing Fee. 99-07219
08/24/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order or judgment appealed from filed in district court on: August 23, 1999. 99-07899
09/17/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus. " . . . we deny the petition." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 99-08809
10/13/1999RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 99-09915
10/13/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.