judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-89-00277-CV
13-89-00277-CV
07/18/1989
Personal Injuries/Damages
Peraglie, Bruno R., Dr.
Sexton, Rebecca G.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/05/1990Mandate Issued
12/11/1989ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
11/30/1989Letter sent
11/27/1989Letter sent
11/21/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispDismissed as Moot
11/21/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Dismissed as Moot
11/21/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/21/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedDismissed as Moot
11/21/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
10/06/1989Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
10/06/1989Statement of Facts Received
10/06/1989Sworn Statement filed
10/06/1989Exhibits received
10/06/1989Letter sent
09/29/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
09/28/1989Letter sent
09/22/1989Response to _____________.
09/22/1989Response to _____________.
09/19/1989A COPY OF THE COST BOND
09/18/1989Filing Fee Paid
09/14/1989Green card in
09/13/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/13/1989Motion for extension of time to file statement
09/12/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
09/12/1989ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
09/08/198910 day letter sent
08/31/1989Motion for leave to file bond disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/24/1989Filing Fee Paid
08/22/19897 day letter
08/04/1989Supplemental transcript filed
08/04/1989Supplemental transcript recieved
08/02/1989Transcript Filed
08/02/1989Transcript Received
08/02/1989Due date for record to be filed
07/24/1989Filing Fee Paid
07/18/1989Motion for leave to file appeal bond
07/18/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/05/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
357th District Court
Cameron
Honorable Rogelio Valdez
04-87-1613-E