judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

EDWARD N. ROBERTS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1448
Short Caption:EDWARD N. ROBERTS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-2381-10Filed Date:11/19/2010

Opening Event Date:11/19/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/04/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/14/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/14/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/05/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEdward N. Roberts Y
Khadijah R. AliYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Karen Shinskie YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/19/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/03/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Khadijah Ali, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal nunc pro tunc to November 19, 2010. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
12/03/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Khadijah Ali, Esquire
01/03/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
03/29/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (91 pgs/Ramos) 8/10/10 proc.
03/29/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (92-254 pgs/Ramos) 8/11/10 proc.
03/29/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (255-396 pgs/Ramos) 8/12/10 proc.
03/29/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (397-404 pgs/Ramos) 8/13/10 proc.
03/29/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (28 pgs/tape) 11/2/10 proc.
04/04/2011RECORD COPIES
04/04/2011RECORD INDEX
04/04/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/25/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
06/07/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 45 days. no oppo
06/10/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before July 21, 2011. (JAC)
07/21/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appellant's Brief for 45 days (no oppo). Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
07/29/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief to 8/15/11.
08/19/2011FiledOrder directing appellant to file brief and limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave w/in 15 days.
09/06/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File (Appellant)
09/13/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to file the brief and limited appendix.
09/13/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
09/13/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
10/13/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)
10/17/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief to 11/14/11.
11/14/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
11/14/2011FiledBriefing Completed
01/05/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/14/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Washington, Oberly, Pryor
08/10/2012FiledVacated In Part/Remanded In Part (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Oberly, Associate Judge, and Pryor, Senior Judge.)
09/05/2012FiledMandate