judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-89-00180-CV
12-89-00180-CV
07/18/1989
Divorce
Hardin, Grady Floyd
Hardin, Carol Ann
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/27/2002Case has been destroyed/Records Retention Action
08/23/1990
08/15/1990Mandate Issued
07/31/1990
07/16/1990
06/29/1990No Description Available.Affirmed
06/29/1990Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
06/21/1990Submitted
06/21/1990Submission
06/20/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
05/31/1990
05/31/1990Submission
04/19/1990Motion for Leave to File DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/19/1990Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
04/19/1990Motion for Leave to File DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/12/1990Brief Received
04/12/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
04/06/1990Motion for Leave to File
04/04/1990Brief Filed
04/04/1990Brief Received
04/04/1990Motion for Leave to File
11/03/1989
10/31/1989Brief Filed
10/31/1989Case ready to be set
10/23/1989Letter from the Court
10/06/1989Brief Filed
09/07/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/07/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
08/31/1989Letter from the Court
08/24/1989Letter from the Court
08/15/1989Letter from the Court
08/14/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/20/1989
07/18/1989No Description Available.
07/18/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/07/1989Surety Bond Filed
05/23/1989Judgment from the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/27/2002Case DestroyedCase Destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hardin, Carol AnnAppellee
Hardin, Grady FloydAppellant
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 1
Henderson
CC-88-173