judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-89-00180-CR
09-89-00180-CR
07/19/1989
Assault or Attempted Murder
Shugart, Stephen Blake
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/11/1991Mandate Issued
01/09/1991Case Returned from Higher Ct.
12/05/1990Petition for ReviewRefused
10/23/1990Memorandum to Clerk
09/27/1990Petition for Review
08/29/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/16/1990Submitted
05/16/1990Submission
05/10/1990Letter
03/23/1990Submission
02/22/1990Motion for oral argument disposedMotion or Writ Denied
02/16/1990Motion for oral argument filed
12/18/1989Brief Filed
12/18/1989Case ready to be set
12/07/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/29/1989Letter
11/29/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/09/1989Brief Filed
10/10/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/13/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
09/11/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
08/14/1989Transcript Filed
07/19/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/19/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/11/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law
Orange
Honorable Michael W. Shuff
49044
$1,500 + cost + 1 yr prob.