judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8875
C-8875
07/19/1989
App Writ of Error
VASTINE STEPHENS
ANGELINA NATIONAL BANK LUFKIN TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
08/01/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
07/19/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
01/22/1990Record returned to Court of AppealsNO REHEARING FILED
12/20/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
08/09/1989Case forwarded to Court
08/09/1989No description available.
08/01/1989Reply to Response
07/19/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
01/22/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
09-88-00179-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
772 SW2d 545, 06-01-89
9th Court of Appeals
Honorable JACK BROOKSHIRE
Trial Court Information
159th District Court
Angelina
Honorable David Walker
20,693-85-5