judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-89-00181-CR
12-89-00181-CR
07/19/1989
All Misdemeanors
Texas, The State of
Kelley, Clayton Webster
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/18/1989
12/13/1989Mandate Issued
11/27/1989
11/09/1989
10/25/1989No Description Available.Dismissed
10/25/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
10/25/1989Case ready to be set
10/25/1989Submission
10/25/1989Submitted
09/25/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/19/1989Motion for Leave to File
08/30/1989No Description Available.
08/25/1989
07/19/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/10/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/26/1989Judgment from the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/15/2014RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
12/18/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law
Smith
Honorable Randall Lee Rogers
62,586