judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00847-CR
05-89-00847-CR
07/18/1989
Theft
Puckett, Mark Anthony
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/09/1992Letter issued by the court
04/04/1991Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review-CCAMotion or Writ Denied
03/27/1991Mandate Issued
03/27/1991Mandate Issued
03/15/1991Case Returned from Higher Ct.
03/12/1991Letter received
03/12/1991Letter issued by the court
12/06/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FiledRefused
10/24/1990Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review-CCAMotion or Writ Granted
10/19/1990Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals
09/19/1990Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
09/19/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/19/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/05/1990Submission
06/05/1990Submitted
06/05/1990Submission
06/05/1990Submitted
04/11/1990MattConv
02/12/1990Case ready to be set
02/12/1990Brief Filed
02/12/1990Case ready to be set
01/17/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/16/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/19/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/15/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/28/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/21/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/20/1989Brief Filed
10/11/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/10/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/06/1989Transcript Filed
08/25/1989Statement of Facts Filed
07/18/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/18/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/12/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/27/1991Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 2
Dallas
Honorable William Black
F89-78487-I
50 yrs TDC