judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KAIGLER (KIMBERLY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38263
Short Caption:KAIGLER (KIMBERLY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C173731Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/02/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/02/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-13100
08/02/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 5/16/01 through 5/17/01. Court Reporters: Joe D'Amato and Maureen Schorn. Filed in district court on: July 27, 2001. 01-13101
08/31/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-14784
09/10/2001TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: May 16, 2001. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. 01-15208
09/24/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Court reporter or recorder Joe D'Amato shall file the requested transcripts within 10 days of this order or show cause why he should not be sanctioned. The motion for an extension of time is granted. The fast track statement and appendix shall be filed and served within 30 days of this order. 01-16027
10/04/2001TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: May 17, 2001. Court Reporter: Joseph A. D'Amato. 01-16701
10/29/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-18031
11/06/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed October 29, 2001. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. 01-18500
11/29/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-19971
11/29/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-19973
12/18/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-21355
02/12/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. 'ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED.' SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-02805
03/12/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-02875
03/12/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/01/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 20, 2002. 02-02875