judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

REBECCA L. THOMPSON v. JON PETER THOMPSON

Case Heading (S-08-0265)
Case Number:S-08-0265Case Docketed On:12/11/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Sublette CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:REBECCA L. THOMPSON v. JON PETER THOMPSON
Full Title:REBECCA L. THOMPSON, Appellant (Defendant), v. JON PETER THOMPSON, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRebecca L. ThompsonLea Jacobs Kuvinka
AppelleeJon Peter ThompsonElizabeth Greenwood

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/11/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/11/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/11/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/11/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/22/2008Motion - Stay - otherMotionStay - otherFinal
12/29/2008Event - Hardcopy received - motion for stay of proceedingsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/05/2009Order - Dismiss - involuntaryOrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
01/21/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal