judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TERENCE K. BETHEA V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1447
Short Caption:TERENCE K. BETHEA V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-16616-09Filed Date:11/18/2010

Opening Event Date:11/18/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/25/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/17/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/16/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/26/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTerence K. Bethea YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Adam B. Schwartz YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/18/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/03/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Joanne M. Vasco, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
12/03/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Joanne M. Vasco, Esquire
12/22/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
04/19/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (199 pgs/McCarn) 3/24/10 proc.
04/19/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (35 pgs/McCarn) 3/25/10 proc.
04/19/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (53 pgs/Allison) 5/17/10 proc. a.m.
04/19/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (34 pgs/Price) 5/17/10 proc. p.m.
04/19/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (141 pgs/Price) 5/19/10 proc.
04/19/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (236 pgs/Rogers) 5/20/10 proc.
04/19/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (225 pgs/Walker) 5/24-26/10 proc.
04/19/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (23 pgs/Burr) 10/29/10 proc. w/cd
04/25/2011RECORD COPIES
04/25/2011RECORD INDEX
04/25/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/03/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
06/14/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 90 days (no oppo)
06/24/2011 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before September 12, 2011. (Castillo)
07/07/2011RECEIVED Appellant's request for new counsel.
07/26/2011LodgedAffidavit in Support of Motion for Appointment of New Counsel. (Appellant)
07/28/2011FiledLetter To counsel for appellant referring appellant's request for new counsel and supporting affidavit.
09/12/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
09/12/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
10/17/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
10/17/2011FiledBriefing Completed
11/18/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/16/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, Oberly, Reid
03/02/2012FiledVacated In Part/Affirmed In Part/Remanded In Part (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Oberly, Associate Judges and Reid, Senior Judge)
03/14/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
03/26/2012FiledMandate
04/17/2012FiledMotion To Recall The Mandate (Appellant)Denied
04/30/2012FiledTMC//MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE
03/20/2013FiledORDER DENYING MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE
04/19/2013LodgedPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)