judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-89-00232-CV
08-89-00232-CV
07/21/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Rodarte, Esther C. et al.
Carrier Corporation
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/17/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
08/28/1990Shuck purged
08/28/1990Mandate Issued
08/28/1990Mandate Issued
08/10/1990Case Returned from Higher Court
08/10/1990Decision from Supreme Court or CCADismissed
05/14/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
05/03/1990Application for Writ of Error
05/03/1990Fee paid
04/23/1990Fee paid
04/16/1990Fee paid
04/04/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
03/22/1990Fee paid
03/19/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/07/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/07/1990Payment of fee due requested
03/07/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/16/1990Submitted
02/16/1990Submission
02/16/1990Submitted
02/15/1990Miscellaneous filing
01/05/1990Submission
01/03/1990Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/03/1990Order entered
12/29/1989Miscellaneous Motion Filed
12/22/1989Submission
11/22/1989Brief Filed
11/22/1989Case ready to be set
11/22/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/22/1989Supplemental Transcript Filed
11/22/1989Case ready to be set
11/15/1989Motion for leave to file disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/15/1989Order entered
11/06/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
11/03/1989Motion for leave to * filed
10/13/1989Supplemental Transcript Filed
10/04/1989Brief Filed
10/04/1989Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/04/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/04/1989Order entered
09/22/1989Brief Filed
09/22/1989Miscellaneous Motion Filed
09/21/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
09/06/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/21/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
08/07/1989Fee paid
07/21/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/21/1989Payment of fee due requested
07/21/1989Transcript Filed
07/21/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/17/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppelleeHon. James R. Dennis
UnknownAppellantHon. Susan Larsen
UnknownAppelleeJeffrey S. Alley
UnknownAppelleeHon. George W. Finger
Trial Court Information
34th District Court
El Paso
83-6722