judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00675-CV
14-89-00675-CV
07/21/1989
Workers Compensation
Hamilton, Carrie
City of Houston
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/07/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
11/16/1990Case stored
11/16/1990Mandate Issued
11/16/1990Mandate Issued
11/01/1990Writ of Error DISPOSEDDENIED
07/20/1990Writ of Error FILED
07/02/1990Writ of Error FILED
05/31/1990Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
05/21/1990Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
05/21/1990Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
05/10/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
05/10/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
04/17/1990Submitted
04/17/1990Submission
04/17/1990Submitted
03/21/1990Submission
11/09/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/09/1989Case ready to be set
11/09/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
11/09/1989Case ready to be set
11/07/1989Brf.RECD.ARGU.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA
10/23/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/09/1989No description available.
09/28/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/28/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
09/28/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
09/13/1989Brf.RECD.ARGU.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA
09/13/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
09/06/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/08/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
08/03/1989Extend time to file record FILED-ANT,APEGRANTED
07/24/1989Extend time to file record FILED - ANT, APE, APP
07/21/1989Transcript FILED
07/21/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/26/1989Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/07/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantBlair A. Bisbey
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeDiana K. Ball
Trial Court Information
157th District Court
Harris
83-71208