judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00676-CV
14-89-00676-CV
07/21/1989
Contract
Johnson, Jr., Et Al, Gaylord
Villas, III, Malcom B. and Sudduth, Daniel D.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/07/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
01/02/1990Case stored
11/13/1989Mandate Issued
11/13/1989Mandate Issued
10/27/1989No motion for rehearing FILED
10/12/1989Mtn.dismiss DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STAGRANTED
10/12/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
10/12/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
10/05/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
10/05/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
09/19/1989Mtn.Dismiss FILED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA
09/15/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
08/31/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
08/31/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
08/18/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/18/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
07/25/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
07/21/1989Transcript FILED
07/21/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/26/1989Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/07/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeHon. Brian T. Hanlon
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantCharles J. Jacobus
Trial Court Information
127th District Court
Harris
Honorable SAMUEL GORDON WOOD
87-42878