judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-94-00516-CR
05-94-00516-CR
03/30/1994
Sale/Delivery of Cocaine
Garcia, Sammy Mendez
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/31/2014Letter issued by the court
12/22/2014Letter received
04/20/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
04/20/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
03/30/1994Notice Sent
03/30/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
02/16/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
01/04/1994Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/20/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
194th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable F. H. Entz
F92-46299-TM
35 yrs TDC