judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: AP-70,887
AP-70,887
07/21/1989
Appeal Case Type
GOODMAN, EX PARTE MICHAEL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
09/11/1989BRIEF FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/19/1991MANDATE ISSD
07/03/1991REHEAR DISPDENIED
06/17/1991REHEAR FILED
05/29/1991OPINION ISSDHC Relief granted
05/29/1991OPINION ISSDHC Relief granted
09/13/1989SUBMITTED
09/11/1989BRIEF FILED
07/21/1989WRIT FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/19/1991STOREDCASE STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn Holmes
GOODMAN, EX PARTE MICHAELApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Alex Bunin
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
232nd District Court
Harris
Honorable A. D. AZIOS
314845-B