judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-94-00513-CR
05-94-00513-CR
03/30/1994
Excessive Bond
Jimmy Roger Oldham, Relator
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/04/1995Case stored
03/04/1995Mandate Issued
03/04/1995Mandate Issued
02/14/1995Mandate due to be issued
12/14/1994Order EnteredDismissed
12/14/1994Order EnteredDismissed
12/05/1994Response to Motion
12/01/1994Submission
11/16/1994Letter Sent by the Court
11/01/1994MattConv
08/05/1994Letter Sent by the Court
05/04/1994MattConv
05/04/1994Statement of Facts Filed
04/05/1994Transcript Filed
03/30/1994Notice Sent
03/30/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/21/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
03/18/1994Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/04/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
204th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Lena Levario
WX94-00138-Q
Excessive Bond