judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TIMOTHY E. KELLY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1441
Short Caption:TIMOTHY E. KELLY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Sentencing Issues only
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-12067-09Filed Date:11/15/2010

Opening Event Date:11/15/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/02/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTimothy E. Kelly YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/15/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/06/2010 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL W/N 20 DAYS fromthe date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been UNTIMELY FILED. (BY: ETW)
12/06/2010TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
12/17/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Appellant's), and for appointment of counsel. Denied Without Prejudice
01/11/2011 ORDERED that the APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED as UNTIMELY FILED, but W/O PREJUDICE to appelalnt seeking an extension of time in Superior Court on the grounds of excusable neglect or good cause and if granted to filing a mo;tion to reinstate the appeal in this court. See DC App. R. 4 (a)(5). It is FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL IS DENIED W/O PREJUDICE to filing a new motion if the Superior Court grants an extension of time and appellant files a motion to reinstate the appeal in this court. (RZTEFA) (rn)
01/11/2011DISMISSED
02/02/2011MANDATE ISSUED