judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CAPRIO-AGUIRRE VS. AGUIRRE

Case Information: 38260
Short Caption:CAPRIO-AGUIRRE VS. AGUIRRECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - DV0003086Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/21/2001 / Morgan, AnnSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/02/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Law Office of Mark L. Sturdivant--check no. 3584.
08/02/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-13077
08/21/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ann Morgan. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/21/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Called for a certificate of service. Due date: 10 days. 01-14184
08/22/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. fo Docketing Statement filed on 08/21/01. 01-14247
08/23/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Ann Morgan.
01/10/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. for Clarkson Law Office, Ltd. 02-00679
03/14/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 02-04667
03/14/2002Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 02-04668
04/02/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b) NNP/CLK 02-05862