judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DOYLE and MARGARET M. HARTMAN, JOHN H. HENDRIX CORPORATION, MICHAEL L. KLEIN and JEANNE KLEIN, RONNIE H. WESTBROOK and KAREN WESTBROOK v. ULTRA RESOURCES, INC., a Wyoming corporation, SHELL ROCKY MOUNTAIN PRODUCTION, LLC, a Delaware corporation, LANCE OIL & GAS COMPANY, a Delaware corporation, SWEPI, LP, a Delaware limited partnership, WILLIAMS PRODUCTION ROCKY MOUNTAIN CO., a Delaware corporation, and ARROWHEAD RESOURCES (U.S.A.) LTD.

Case Heading (S-08-0262)
Case Number:S-08-0262Case Docketed On:12/10/2008
Linked To: S-08-0258 , S-08-0261 , S-08-0259 , S-08-0260 , S-08-0263 , S-08-0264
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Sublette CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Mines and Minerals (Title 30)
Short Title:DOYLE and MARGARET M. HARTMAN, JOHN H. HENDRIX CORPORATION, MICHAEL L. KLEIN and JEANNE KLEIN, RONNIE H. WESTBROOK and KAREN WESTBROOK v. ULTRA RESOURCES, INC., a Wyoming corporation, SHELL ROCKY MOUNTAIN PRODUCTION, LLC, a Delaware corporation, LANCE OIL & GAS COMPANY, a Delaware corporation, SWEPI, LP, a Delaware limited partnership, WILLIAMS PRODUCTION ROCKY MOUNTAIN CO., a Delaware corporation, and ARROWHEAD RESOURCES (U.S.A.) LTD.
Full Title:DOYLE and MARGARET M. HARTMAN, JOHN H. HENDRIX CORPORATION, MICHAEL L. KLEIN and JEANNE KLEIN, RONNIE H. WESTBROOK and KAREN WESTBROOK, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. ULTRA RESOURCES, INC., a Wyoming corporation, SHELL ROCKY MOUNTAIN PRODUCTION, LLC, a Delaware corporation, LANCE OIL & GAS COMPANY, a Delaware corporation, SWEPI, LP, a Delaware limited partnership, WILLIAMS PRODUCTION ROCKY MOUNTAIN CO., a Delaware corporation, and ARROWHEAD RESOURCES (U.S.A.) LTD., Appellees (Defendants)

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDoyle HartmanMichael J. Sullivan
John A. Masterson
Jake Eugene Gallegos
Michael J. Condon
James M. Lyons
D. Elizabeth Wills
AppellantMargaret M. HartmanMichael J. Sullivan
John A. Masterson
Jake Eugene Gallegos
Michael J. Condon
James M. Lyons
D. Elizabeth Wills
AppellantJohn H. Hendrix CorporationMichael J. Sullivan
John A. Masterson
Jake Eugene Gallegos
Michael J. Condon
James M. Lyons
D. Elizabeth Wills
AppellantMichael L. KleinMichael J. Sullivan
John A. Masterson
Jake Eugene Gallegos
Michael J. Condon
James M. Lyons
D. Elizabeth Wills
AppellantJeanne KleinMichael J. Sullivan
John A. Masterson
Jake Eugene Gallegos
Michael J. Condon
James M. Lyons
D. Elizabeth Wills
AppellantRonnie H. WestbrookMichael J. Sullivan
John A. Masterson
Jake Eugene Gallegos
Michael J. Condon
James M. Lyons
D. Elizabeth Wills
AppellantKaren WestbrookMichael J. Sullivan
John A. Masterson
Jake Eugene Gallegos
Michael J. Condon
James M. Lyons
D. Elizabeth Wills
AppelleeUltra Resources, Inc., a Wyoming corporationDouglas James Mason
George W. Mueller
AppelleeShell Rocky Mountain Production, LLC, a Delaware corporationDavid B. Hooper
Phillip D. Barber
AppelleeLance Oil & Gas Company, a Delaware corporationPaul J. Hickey
Ezekiel James Williams
David W. Stark
AppelleeSWEPI, LP, a Delaware limited partnershipDavid B. Hooper
Phillip D. Barber
AppelleeWilliams Production RMT CompanyDouglas James Mason
George W. Mueller
AppelleeArrowhead Resources (U.S.A.) LTD.Rebecca H. Noecker
Nancy D. Freudenthal

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Attorney Fees, Contracts, Limitation of Actions, Natural Resources - Oil and Gas, Trial - Damages
Opinion Number:2010 WY 36
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/10/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/10/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/10/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/10/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/18/2008Order - Pro hac vice - allowing George W. Mueller to appear on behalf of defendants Ultra Resources, Inc. and Williams Production Rocky Mountain Co. as co-counsel with Douglas J. Mason (admitted in all cases with Mr. Mason per motion filed in S-08-0258).OrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
12/23/2008Order - Pro hac vice - allow. Order granting admission of attorney pro hac vice. Phillip D. Barber admitted to practice on behalf of appellant Shell Rocky Mountain Production , LLC as co-counsel with David B. Hooper in case numbers S-08-0261, S-08-0262 & S-08-0264 only.OrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
12/23/2008Order - Pro hac vice - allow (Revised) Order granting admission of attorney pro hac vice. George W. Mueller admitted to practice before this court in case numbers S-08-0258, S-08-0262 & S-08-0263 only.OrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
12/30/2008Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance by John A. Masterson on behalf of appellants and appellees in S-08-0258, S-08-0259, S-08-0260, S-08-0261, S-08-0263 and S-08-0264Notice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
12/31/2008Motion - Other - Admission Pro Hac ViceMotionOtherFinal
01/02/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Admission Pro Hac ViceEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/02/2009Order - Pro hac vice - allow Jake Eugene Gallegos and Michael J. Condon to appear on behalf of Appellants in S-08-0258, S-08-0259, S-08-0260, S-08-0261, S-08-0262, S-08-0263, and S-08-0264OrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
01/09/2009Motion - Other - Admission Pro Hac ViceMotionOtherFinal
01/12/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/12/2009Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance by Paul J. Hickey on behalf of Lance Oil & Gas Company in cases S-08-0260 & S-08-0262 only.Notice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
01/12/2009Order - Pro hac vice - allow. Order granting admissions of attorneys pro hac vice - Ezekiel James Williams and David W. Stark admitted on behalf of appellant Lance Oil & Gas Company as co-counsel with Paul J. Hickey in case numbers S-08-0260 & S-08-0262 only.OrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
01/13/2009Order - Pro hac vice - allow. Order granting admission of attorneys pro hac vice. James M. Lyons and D. Elizabeth Wills admitted to practice in case numbers S-08-0258, S-08-0259, S-08-0260, S-08-0261, S-08-0262, S-08-0263 and S-08-0264 as co-counsel with Michael J. Sullivan, John A. Masterson, Jake Eugene Gallegos and Michael J. Condon.OrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
01/27/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/28/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Plaintiffs/Appellants' brief-in-chief; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/03/2009Order - Consolidating casesOrderConsolidating casesFinal
02/25/2009Notice-Incoming - Change of address for Ezekiel J. Williams.Notice-IncomingChange of addressFinal
03/03/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/03/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to permit filing of consolidated response briefs on the same schedule as related appeals.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/03/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Change of address for Ezekiel J. WilliamsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/04/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/30/2009Brief - Appellees Lance Oil & Gas Company and Arrowhead ResourcesBriefAppelleeFinal
03/30/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellees Arrowhead Resources (U.S.A.) Ltd. and Lance Oil & Gas Company, Inc., in response to appellants' brief-in-chief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/31/2009Brief - Appellee - Shell, Swepi, LP, Williams Production, and Ultra Resources. (Brief submitted on 3/30/09, but system error occurred. System corrected after 5:00 p.m.) Accepted as timely.BriefAppelleeFinal
04/01/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Joint Response Brief of Appellees Shell Rocky Mountain Production LLC, Ultra Resources, Inc., SWEPI, LP and Williams Production Rocky Mountain CompanyEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/02/2009Motion - Correct a DocumentMotionCorrect a DocumentFinal
04/03/2009Order - Other - Order to permit correction of a document (appendix for appellant's brief is supplemented).OrderOtherFinal
04/03/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' Motion to Correct a DocumentEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/08/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/13/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Nancy Freudenthal and Rebecca Noecker for appellee Arrowhead Resources (USA) Ltd.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/14/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - George Mueller for Ultra Resources and Williams Production.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/17/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
04/20/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/20/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Phillip Barber and David Hooper for Shell Rocky Mountain Production and SWEPI, LP.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/20/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/29/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jake Gallegos, Michael J. Condon and Michael J. Sullivan on behalf of Hartmans, et al.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/12/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, thirty-seven volumes. Volumes I-XXIV, Original Papers; Volumes XXV-XXVI, Depositions; Volumes XXVII-XXX, Transcripts; Volumes XXXI-XXXVII, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/12/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/14/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Phillip D. Barber, Nancy D. Freudenthal, Paul J. Hickey, David B. Hooper, Douglas James Mason, George W. Mueller, Rebecca H. Noecker, David W. Stark, and Ezekiel James Williams, argument by Ms. Freudenthal and Messrs. Barber, Mueller and Hickey for appellants; and Michael J. Condon, Jake Eugene Gallegos, James M. Lyons, John A. Masterson, Michael J. Sullivan and D. Elizabeth Wills, argument by Messrs. Gallegos and Sullivan for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/14/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/23/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part. Justice Kite writing for the Court, Chief Justice Voigt filed a dissenting opinion.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/06/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' petition for rehearing; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/21/2010Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
04/21/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/21/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/21/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/21/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/06/2010Service - Other - UPS tracking printout for record (7 boxes) delivered 4/26/10 to Clerk of District Court.ServiceOtherFinal