judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 94-0304
94-0304
03/31/1994
See former TRAP 130(D)
RAUL JUNIOR MARTINEZ
JOSE MARTINEZ
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/24/1994Reply to ResponseRespondent
05/10/1994Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
07/19/1994list missing briefs when case is separated(remarksCOA Brief: 1 Ant Br
07/19/1994Record returned to Court of AppealsNo Mo/Re filed
06/15/1994Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedApp denied
05/24/1994Reply to Response
05/16/1994MET to file reply disposed ofForm Letter sent in response to motion for extension of time
05/16/1994Case forwarded to Court
05/10/1994Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/10/1994Notice requesting filing fee$10 for M/E/T to file Reply to Santiago Sandoval also requested 9 more copies
05/09/1994Phone call from Clerk's Officeto COA - APP HAS BEEN FILED 04-15-94
04/08/1994APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ERROR IS DUE TO BE FILED04-18-94
04/08/1994Extension of time to file app writ err disposed ofFiling grantedApp due on or before 04-18-94
03/31/1994Extension of time to file app writ err filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
07/18/1994Case StoredCase stored.No Mo/Re filed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
MARTINEZ, JOSERespondentMr. "Jimmy" Santiago Sandoval
MARTINEZ, RAUL JUNIORPetitionerMr. Equardo Jaime
Court of Appeals Information:
04-93-00333-CV
Reversed & Remanded
RULE 90, 01-05-94
4th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 1
Webb
Honorable Raul Vasquez
P-90-0159-C2