judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SHELL ROCKY MOUNTAIN PRODUCTION, LLC, a Delaware corporation and SWEPI, LP a Delaware limited partnership v. DOYLE and MARGARET M. HARTMAN, JOHN H. HENDRIX CORPORATION, MICHAEL L. KLEIN and JEANNE KLEIN, RONNIE H. WESTBROOK and KAREN WESTBROOK

Case Heading (S-08-0261)
Case Number:S-08-0261Case Docketed On:12/10/2008
Linked To: S-08-0258 , S-08-0259 , S-08-0260 , S-08-0262 , S-08-0263 , S-08-0264
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Sublette CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Mines and Minerals (Title 30)
Short Title:SHELL ROCKY MOUNTAIN PRODUCTION, LLC, a Delaware corporation and SWEPI, LP a Delaware limited partnership v. DOYLE and MARGARET M. HARTMAN, JOHN H. HENDRIX CORPORATION, MICHAEL L. KLEIN and JEANNE KLEIN, RONNIE H. WESTBROOK and KAREN WESTBROOK
Full Title:SHELL ROCKY MOUNTAIN PRODUCTION, LLC, a Delaware corporation and SWEPI, LP a Delaware limited partnership, Appellants (Defendants), v. DOYLE and MARGARET M. HARTMAN, JOHN H. HENDRIX CORPORATION, MICHAEL L. KLEIN and JEANNE KLEIN, RONNIE H. WESTBROOK and KAREN WESTBROOK, Appellees (Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantShell Rocky Mountain Production, LLC, a Delaware corporationDavid B. Hooper
Phillip D. Barber
AppellantSWEPI, LP, a Delaware limited partnershipDavid B. Hooper
Phillip D. Barber
AppelleeDoyle HartmanMichael J. Sullivan
John A. Masterson
Jake Eugene Gallegos
Michael J. Condon
James M. Lyons
D. Elizabeth Wills
AppelleeMargaret M. HartmanMichael J. Sullivan
John A. Masterson
Jake Eugene Gallegos
Michael J. Condon
James M. Lyons
D. Elizabeth Wills
AppelleeJohn H. Hendrix CorporationMichael J. Sullivan
John A. Masterson
Jake Eugene Gallegos
Michael J. Condon
James M. Lyons
D. Elizabeth Wills
AppelleeMichael L. KleinMichael J. Sullivan
John A. Masterson
Jake Eugene Gallegos
Michael J. Condon
James M. Lyons
D. Elizabeth Wills
AppelleeJeanne KleinMichael J. Sullivan
John A. Masterson
Jake Eugene Gallegos
Michael J. Condon
James M. Lyons
D. Elizabeth Wills
AppelleeRonnie H. WestbrookMichael J. Sullivan
John A. Masterson
Jake Eugene Gallegos
Michael J. Condon
James M. Lyons
D. Elizabeth Wills
AppelleeKaren WestbrookMichael J. Sullivan
John A. Masterson
Jake Eugene Gallegos
Michael J. Condon
James M. Lyons
D. Elizabeth Wills

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Attorney Fees, Contracts, Limitation of Actions, Natural Resources - Oil and Gas, Trial - Damages
Opinion Number:2010 WY 36
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/10/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/10/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/10/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/10/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/23/2008Order - Pro hac vice - allow. Order granting admission of attorney pro hac vice. Phillip D. Barber admitted to practice on behalf of appellant Shell Rocky Mountain Production , LLC as co-counsel with David B. Hooper in case numbers S-08-0261, S-08-0262 & S-08-0264 only.OrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
12/30/2008Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance by John Masterson on behalf of appelleesNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
01/02/2009Order - Pro hac vice - allow Jake Eugene Gallegos and Michael J. Condon to appear on behalf of Appellants in S-08-0258, S-08-0259, S-08-0260, S-08-0261, S-08-0262, S-08-0263, and S-08-0264OrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
01/13/2009Motion - Brief - exceed page limitMotionBrief - exceed page limitFinal
01/13/2009Order - Pro hac vice - allow. Order granting admission of attorneys pro hac vice. James M. Lyons and D. Elizabeth Wills admitted to practice in case numbers S-08-0258, S-08-0259, S-08-0260, S-08-0261, S-08-0262, S-08-0263 and S-08-0264 as co-counsel with Michael J. Sullivan, John A. Masterson, Jake Eugene Gallegos and Michael J. Condon.OrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
01/14/2009Event - Hardcopy received Motion to Permit Filing of Joint Opening Brief and to Exceed Page LimitEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/21/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/22/2009Event - Hardcopy received Motion to Extend Deadline for Filing Opeing BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/23/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/03/2009Order - Granting Motion to Permit Filing of Joint Opening Brief and Order Granting Motion to Exceed Page LimitOrderGrantFinal
02/03/2009Order - Consolidating casesOrderConsolidating casesFinal
02/09/2009Brief - Appellant - E-filed in S-08-0258BriefAppellantFinal
02/11/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Joint opening brief of appellants Shell Rocky Mountain Production LLC, Ultra Resources, Inc., Swepi, LP and Williams Production Rocky Mountain Company.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/12/2009Notice-Incoming - Statement of costs (e-filed in S-09-0258)Notice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
02/17/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants Shell Rocky Mountain Production LLC, Ultra Resources, Inc., Swepi, LP, and Williams Production Rocky Mountain Co. statement of costs of original transcript.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/26/2009Motion - Consolidate and Extension of Page LimitMotionConsolidateFinal
02/27/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of TimeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/27/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Permit Filing of Appelless' Consolidated Brief and for Extension of Page LimitEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/24/2009Order - Granting Motion to Permit Filing of Consolidated Brief and Order Granting Motion for Extension of Page LimitOrderGrantFinal
03/30/2009Brief - AppelleesBriefAppelleeFinal
03/31/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Consolidated brief of Plaintiffs/AppelleesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/08/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/14/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - George Mueller for Ultra Resources and Williams Production.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/17/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
04/20/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/20/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Phillip Barber and David Hooper for Shell Rocky Mountain Production and SWEPI, LP.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/20/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Joint Reply Brief of Appellants Shell Rocky Mountain Production LLC, Ultra Resources, Inc., SWEPI, LP and Williams Production Rocky Mountain CompanyEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/29/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jake Gallegos, Michael J. Condon and Michael J. Sullivan on behalf of Hartmans, et al.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/12/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, thirty-seven volumes. Volumes I-XXIV, Original Papers; Volumes XXV-XXVI, Depositions; Volumes XXVII-XXX, Transcripts; Volumes XXXI-XXXVII, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/12/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/14/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Phillip D. Barber, Nancy D. Freudenthal, Paul J. Hickey, David B. Hooper, Douglas James Mason, George W. Mueller, Rebecca H. Noecker, David W. Stark, and Ezekiel James Williams, argument by Ms. Freudenthal and Messrs. Barber, Mueller and Hickey for appellants; and Michael J. Condon, Jake Eugene Gallegos, James M. Lyons, John A. Masterson, Michael J. Sullivan and D. Elizabeth Wills, argument by Messrs. Gallegos and Sullivan for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/14/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/23/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part. Justice Kite writing for the Court, Chief Justice Voigt filed a dissenting opinion.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/06/2010Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
04/06/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' petition for rehearing; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/21/2010Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
04/21/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/21/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/21/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/21/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/06/2010Service - Other - UPS tracking printout for record (7 boxes) delivered 4/26/10 to Clerk of District Court.ServiceOtherFinal