judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOHN PREPETIT V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1440
Short Caption:JOHN PREPETIT V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL9432-89Filed Date:11/15/2010

Opening Event Date:11/15/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/23/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/20/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Prepetit YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/15/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/03/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on November 15, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
12/23/2010RECORD INDEX
12/23/2010RECORD COPIES
12/23/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/29/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
01/19/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
01/19/2011APPENDIX to Appellant's Brief.
01/21/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL
02/03/2011ORDER DENYING APLT MO FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee's brief remains due to be filed on or before February 23, 2011. (By: ETW)
02/23/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
02/24/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - oppo
03/07/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION to Appellee's Motion for Summary Affirmance (Titled: Motion to Grant).
03/07/2011RECEIVED Appellant's Amended Reply to Appellee's Motion for Summary Affirmance.
03/31/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED...SEE HARDCOPY It is *****MORE*****
03/31/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the order on appeal is HEREBY AFFIRMED. (RDKRTE) (rf)
04/18/2011APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING
04/19/2011CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED from Appellant: John Prepetit #18568-016 FCI P.O. Box 7000 Texarkana, TX 75505
04/28/2011ORDER DENYING APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING (pro se petition) (KR,RD,TE) (Judge Reid was an Associate Judge of the court at the time of decision. Her status changed to Associate Judge, Retired, on April 7, 2011.)
05/20/2011MANDATE ISSUED
06/16/2011NOTICE OF DENIAL OF PET. FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI