judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-94-00181-CR
04-94-00181-CR
03/30/1994
Other Drug Sale
Rodriguez, Rosa
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/21/2017Internal memo
02/14/1996Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
02/13/1996Mandate received by the trial court
02/09/1996Mandate Issued
02/09/1996Mandate Issued
02/08/1996Case Returned from Higher Court
01/10/1996Higher Court DecisionRefused
11/02/1995Information regarding cause received
11/01/1995Case Forwarded to Higher Court
10/12/1995Petition for Review Filed
09/13/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/13/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/30/1995Submitted
03/30/1995Submission
03/30/1995Submitted
03/15/1995Exhibits Filed
01/31/1995Motion to Postpone Oral Argument DispMotion or Writ Granted
01/31/1995Motion to Postpone Oral Argument DispMotion or Writ Granted
01/25/1995Motion to Postpone Oral Argument Filed
12/05/1994Motion to Postpone Oral Argument DispMotion or Writ Granted
12/05/1994Motion to Postpone Oral Argument DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/23/1994Motion to Postpone Oral Argument Filed
11/08/1994No Description Available.
11/04/1994Submission
10/21/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/21/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
10/10/1994Brief Filed
10/10/1994No Description Available.
10/10/1994Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
10/10/1994Case ready to be set
10/10/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
10/10/1994Case ready to be set
09/15/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion Granted in Part
09/12/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
07/25/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion Granted in Part
07/08/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
06/16/1994Brief Filed
06/07/1994Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/31/1994No Description Available.
05/27/1994Motion Filed
05/09/1994Order Entered
04/25/1994No Description Available.
04/25/1994No Description Available.
03/30/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/23/1994No Description Available.
03/07/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
02/03/1994Motion for New Trial Filed
01/06/1994Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/09/2021RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
07/21/2017Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Rodriguez, RosaCriminal - AppellantManuel P. Montez
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasTerry Breen
Trial Court Information
81st Judicial District Court
Frio
Honorable Olin Bernard Strauss
93-06-00093-CRF
15 years TDCJ