judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-94-00511-CV
05-94-00511-CV
03/30/1994
Mandamus
Jeffrey L. Estep, Relator
Molly Francis, Judge, County Criminal Court #9, Dallas Count
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/08/2015Order enteredDestroy
08/12/2015Letter issued by the court
06/25/1997Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
04/14/1994Order EnteredDismissed
04/14/1994Order EnteredDismissed
04/13/1994Response to Motion
03/30/1994MattConv
03/30/1994Motion for Leave to File
03/30/1994Motion for Relief DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/30/1994Motion for Relief Filed
03/30/1994Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/30/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/08/2015Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 9
Dallas
Honorable Molly Francis
MB93-19323-K