judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-94-00321-CR
01-94-00321-CR
03/30/1994
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Rodriguez, Julio Salazar
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/03/2016Record Sent
09/09/2016Notice received
12/05/1997Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
10/10/1997Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
07/03/1996Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/03/1996Mandate issued - criminal or civil
06/18/1996Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
05/29/1996Petition for discretionary review disposedRefused
03/22/1996Case file received by higher Court or agency.
03/20/1996Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
03/07/1996Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
03/01/1996Extension of time to file PDR disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals.Grant motion
01/29/1996Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/29/1996Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/29/1996Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/29/1996Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/02/1995Submitted
05/02/1995Submission
05/02/1995Submitted
03/16/1995Submission
02/27/1995Brief Due
02/22/1995Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
02/22/1995Case ready to be set
02/22/1995Case ready to be set
02/02/1995Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
02/02/1995Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
01/20/1995Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
01/19/1995Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
01/16/1995Brief Due
01/06/1995Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
01/04/1995Brief Due
12/22/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
12/06/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
11/03/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
10/20/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
10/12/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
09/22/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
09/13/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
08/11/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
07/29/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
06/29/1994Statement of facts filed
06/29/1994Transcript filed
03/30/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/25/1994Notice of appeal filed
03/01/1994Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/03/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
TEXAS, THE STATE OFCriminal - State of TexasRikke Burke Graber
StateCriminal - AppellantKen J. McLean
Rodriguez, Julio S.AppellantJulio S. Rodriguez
Trial Court Information
209th District Court
Harris
Honorable MICHAEL T. MCSPADDEN
592,275
life