judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-94-00152-CR
03-94-00152-CR
03/30/1994
Theft
Willie Fred Houston
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/11/1996CASE STORED
12/19/1994Mandate Issued
09/28/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/19/1994Brief filed
08/11/1994miscellaneous motion dispDismissed
08/11/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/20/1994miscellaneous motion filed
07/20/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/18/1994Submitted
07/18/1994Submission
06/17/1994Brief filed
06/17/1994Case ready to be set
06/17/1994Submission
06/13/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/10/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/19/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/19/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/17/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/16/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/22/1994Brief filed
04/13/1994Supplemental Transcript filed
03/30/1994Statement of Facts Filed
03/30/1994Supplemental Statement of Facts Filed
03/30/1994Transcript Filed
03/30/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/19/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State Prosecuting AttorneyInterested partyThe Honorable Matthew W. Paul
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasMr. Philip A. Nelson, Jr.
The Honorable Ronald Earle
State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasMr. Robert Smith
Houston, Willie FredAppellantMr. Willie Fred Houston
Mr. Walter C. Prentice
Court Of Criminal AppealsInterested partyThe Honorable Troy C. Bennett Jr.
Trial Court Information
331st District Court
Travis
Honorable Thomas Blackwell
0933855
25 yrs. (HABITUAL)