judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-94-00081-CV
02-94-00081-CV
03/30/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Smith, Jonathan C.
Bacon, Dan, Christian Transportation, Inc. and Eugene C. Christian
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/17/2008Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
09/02/1994Mandate Issued
07/19/1994Motion to Withdraw Appeal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/19/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
06/16/1994Motion to Withdraw Appeal Filed
05/19/1994Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/17/1994Motion Filed
05/06/1994Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/18/1994Motion Filed
03/30/1994No Description Available.
03/30/1994Submission
03/30/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/17/2008Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Christian Transportation, Inc.AppelleeJennifer S. Hamilton
Christian, Eugene C.AppelleeJennifer S. Hamilton
Bacon, DanAppelleeDan Bacon
Smith, Jonathan C.AppellantEric Weisberg
Trial Court Information
48th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Dixon W. Holman
48-140483-92