judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 11-89-00227-CR
11-89-00227-CR
07/21/1989
All Misdemeanors
Moya, Manuel Villareal
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/05/1990Mandate issued
11/16/1989Opinion issued
11/16/1989Opinion issued
11/16/1989Submitted
11/16/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/16/1989Submission set in Eastland
11/09/1989Miscellaneous filing
10/19/1989Miscellaneous filing
10/12/1989Order entered
09/15/1989Inquiring on status, etc. of case
08/18/1989Inquiring on status, etc. of case
08/14/1989TR filed
08/14/1989TR filed
07/21/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/19/1989Judgment of trial court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/05/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court
Howard
Honorable John R Coffee
37,838
$400 fine, 15 days jail