judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-94-00330-CR
14-94-00330-CR
04/06/1994
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Jones, Nateese Lamon
The State of Texas
No
2nd Court of Appeals
10/18/1996
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/18/1996Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsGRANTED
10/18/1996Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsGRANTED
01/04/1996State's brief DUE
12/15/1995Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/15/1995Case ready to be set
12/15/1995Case ready to be set
12/14/1995Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
12/04/1995Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/04/1995State's brief DUE
11/09/1995Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
11/06/1995Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/03/1995State's brief DUE
10/12/1995Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
10/04/1995Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/04/1995State's brief DUE
09/18/1995Appellant's brief DUE
09/06/1995Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/17/1995Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
08/08/1995Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/07/1995Past due brief
08/04/1995Appellant's brief DUE
07/05/1995Statement of Facts Due
07/05/1995Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
06/15/1995Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
06/06/1995Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
05/03/1995No description available.
04/20/1995Statement of Facts Due
04/06/1995Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
04/05/1995Appellant's brief DUE
03/27/1995Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
03/08/1995No description available.
03/06/1995Statement of Facts Due
02/02/1995Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
02/02/1995Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
01/24/1995Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/24/1995Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
01/24/1995Past due brief
01/23/1995Appellant's brief DUE
12/29/1994Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
12/23/1994Appellant's brief DUE
12/21/1994Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/23/1994Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
11/16/1994Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/07/1994Appellant's brief DUE
10/06/1994Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
10/06/1994Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
10/03/1994Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
09/30/1994Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
09/07/1994No description available.
08/11/1994Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
08/02/1994Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
07/26/1994No description available.
06/16/1994Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
06/08/1994Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
05/24/1994No description available.
05/20/1994Transcript FILED
04/06/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/04/1994Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
03/23/1994Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/18/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasWilliam J. Delmore, III
JONES, NATEESE LAMONCriminal - AppellantMike Degeurin
Trial Court Information
338th District Court
Harris
602009
Life TDC