judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-94-00335-CR
01-94-00335-CR
04/05/1994
Theft
McNair, John Ronald
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/09/1995Mandate issued
11/17/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
11/17/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
10/26/1994Motion to withdraw appeal
08/11/1994Order enteredOrder trial court hearing-no brief filed
06/06/1994Brief due for retained counsel
06/02/1994Supplemental transcript filed
05/27/1994Brief due for retained counsel
04/06/1994Transcript filed
04/05/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/04/1994Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/09/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - AppellantJohn Ronald McNair
Trial Court Information
208th District Court
Harris
Honorable DENISE M. COLLINS
601,088
10 yrs tdc