judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-94-00203-CR
04-94-00203-CR
04/05/1994
Other Drug Possession
Saur, Danny Lee
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/23/2016Internal memo
07/14/1995Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
07/13/1995Mandate Issued
07/13/1995Mandate Issued
05/17/1995Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/17/1995Opinion issuedDismissed
05/17/1995Opinion issuedDismissed
05/04/1995Motion for Dismissal Filed
04/25/1995Order Entered
04/05/1995Order Entered
04/05/1995Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/15/1994Order Entered
08/05/1994Motion for Dismissal Filed
06/03/1994No Description Available.
06/03/1994No Description Available.
04/19/1994No Description Available.
04/05/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
04/05/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/04/1994Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/22/2018Case StoredCase archived
07/13/2020RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Saur, Danny LeeCriminal - AppellantMary Roman
Jeffrey J. Sapyta
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasSteven C. Hilbig
Trial Court Information
175th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Sharon S Macrae
93-CR-4876
Probation 10 yrs & $1,000.