judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-94-00215-CV
04-94-00215-CV
04/05/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Lazor, Joan
Ernst, Sr., David
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/29/1994Mandate Issued
12/29/1994Mandate Issued
10/26/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/26/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/06/1994Submitted
10/06/1994Submission
10/06/1994Submitted
09/01/1994Submission
05/31/1994Brief Filed
05/31/1994Case ready to be set
05/31/1994Requests Oral Argument
05/31/1994Case ready to be set
05/13/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/13/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/11/1994Brief Filed
05/11/1994Requests Oral Argument
05/05/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
05/02/1994Alternative Dispute Resolution Procedure Sent
04/05/1994No Description Available.
04/05/1994No Description Available.
04/05/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/03/1994Appeal Bond Filed
02/24/1994Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/29/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Joan LazorAppellantR. Norvell Graham, Jr. Jr.
David Ernst, Sr.AppelleeJeffrey L. Pfeifer
John Michael Doyle
Trial Court Information
225th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Carolyn Spears Petersen
77-CI-14541
N/A