judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: WR-16,890-02
WR-16,890-02
04/06/1994
1107-HC
MORENO, ERNEST
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/08/1995ACTION TAKENHC relief denied WITHOUT written order.
01/23/1995SUPP RECD
11/09/1994ORDER ISSUEDHC Remanded to trial court for evidentiary hearing
09/20/1994SUPP RECD
05/18/1994ORDER ISSUEDHC Remanded to trial court for evidentiary hearing
04/06/1994WRIT RECEIVED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/08/1995STOREDWRIT STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Moreno, ErnestApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)
Court of Appeals Information:
3rd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
22nd District Court
Caldwell
92-026A