judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-94-00093-CR
12-94-00093-CR
04/06/1994
Other Drug Possession
Carner, Kenneth, a/k/a Kenneth Bullard
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/23/1996Letter from the Court
07/22/1996Mandate issued
06/29/1996Petition for discretionary review was not filed
06/14/1996Motion for rehearing was not filed
05/30/1996Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/27/1995Submitted
06/27/1995Submission
06/23/1995Letter from the Court
05/17/1995Submission
04/07/1995No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
04/07/1995Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
03/10/1995No Description Available.
01/09/1995
11/03/1994Brief Filed
11/03/1994Case ready to be set
09/23/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/23/1994Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
09/15/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/24/1994Brief Filed
08/08/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/08/1994Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
07/20/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/24/1994
04/19/1994No Description Available.
04/19/1994No Description Available.
04/12/1994Letter from the Court
04/06/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/04/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
03/16/1994Motion For New Trial filed in trial court
02/25/1994
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/22/1996RetentionCriminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value)
07/22/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Carner, Kenneth A/k/a KennethCriminal - AppellantMr. Hunter Brush
Kenneth CarnerCriminal - AppellantKenneth Carner
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasMr. Edward J. Marty
Trial Court Information
114th District Court
Smith
Honorable Cynthia S. Kent
4-93-1244
75 yrs/TDC